WI SB451 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 186.235 (21); to renumber and amend 186.11 (2); to amend 186.07 (7), 186.098 (1), 186.113 (15) (a), 186.115 (2), 186.118 (1), 186.118 (3) (a) (intro.), 186.118 (4), 186.118 (5), 186.235 (14) (c), 214.04 (21) (b), 215.13 (46) (a) 1., 221.0303 (2), 227.10 (2m), 227.14 (2) (a) 8., 227.20 (3) (c), 227.24 (1) (b) and 227.24 (1) (d); and to create 186.11 (2) (b) and (c), 186.113 (26), 186.118 (3m) and 227.01 (13) (yu) of the statutes; Relating to: authorized activities and operations of credit unions, automated teller machines of financial institutions, repealing rules promulgated by the Department of Financial Institutions, and providing an exemption from rule-making procedures.
Title
Authorized activities and operations of credit unions, automated teller machines of financial institutions, repealing rules promulgated by the Department of Financial Institutions, and providing an exemption from rule-making procedures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Revenue, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Revenue, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stafsholt |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Representative Conley added as a cosponsor |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Representative Stubbs added as a cosponsor |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Representative Sinicki added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Representative Cabrera added as a cosponsor |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Revenue |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Introduced |