WI SB451 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 94.64 (1) (a); to amend 94.64 (3m) (a) (intro.), 94.64 (3m) (a) 1., 94.64 (9) (c), 94.65 (4) (a) (intro.) and 94.65 (4) (b); and to create 94.64 (1) (ag), 94.64 (1) (u), 94.64 (2) (f), 94.64 (3m) (a) 3., 94.65 (1) (bm), 94.65 (1) (fm) and 94.65 (5m) of the statutes; Relating to: the distribution and labeling of fertilizers and soil or plant additives produced from manure. (FE)
Title
The distribution and labeling of fertilizers and soil or plant additives produced from manure. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Representative Plumer added as a cosponsor |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2019-09-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb451 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB451.pdf |