WI SB451 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 441.15 (1) (a); to renumber and amend 655.001 (7t); to amend 441.15 (2) (b), 441.15 (4) and 655.005 (2) (a); and to create 50.36 (3i), 441.15 (1) (c), 655.001 (7t) (b) and 655.002 (2) (d) of the statutes; relating to: hospital staff privileges for and written agreements required for nurse-midwives and allowing nurse-midwives to elect to be covered under the injured patients and families compensation fund.
Title
Hospital staff privileges for and written agreements required for nurse-midwives and allowing nurse-midwives to elect to be covered under the injured patients and families compensation fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-03-22 | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Robson | |
2010-02-17 | Public hearing held | |
2010-01-07 | Read first time and referred to committee on Health, Health Insurance, Privacy, Property Tax Relief, and Revenue | |
2010-01-07 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb451 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB451.pdf |