WI SB45 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Published 3-27-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Published 3-27-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: modifying administrative rules relating to the use of wood to contain bear bait or feed in logs or stumps.
Title
Modifying administrative rules relating to the use of wood to contain bear bait or feed in logs or stumps.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Published 3-27-2021 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-26-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 14 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-24-2021 by directive of the Majority Leader |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2021-03-17 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-03-17 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2021-03-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-03-17 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-03-17 | House | Read a second time |
2021-03-17 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2021-03-11 | House | Placed on calendar 3-17-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-03-11 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-02-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-16-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Introduced |