WI SB448 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 767.41 (4) (d); to amend 767.001 (1) (k), 767.117 (1) (c), 767.215 (2) (j) 1., 767.225 (1) (bm) and 767.89 (6); to repeal and recreate 767.481; and to create 767.14, 767.41 (6) (h), 767.805 (4) (am) and 767.89 (3) (bm) of the statutes; Relating to: relocating with a child who is the subject of a legal custody or physical placement order.
Title
Relocating with a child who is the subject of a legal custody or physical placement order.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-11-16 | Senate | Representative Bowen added as a cosponsor |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb448 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB448.pdf |