WI SB448 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.05 (6) (a) 15., 71.21 (4), 71.26 (2) (a) 4., 71.34 (1k) (g), 71.45 (2) (a) 10. and 77.92 (4); and to create 71.07 (5p), 71.10 (4) (cs), 71.28 (5p), 71.30 (3) (dr), 71.47 (5p) and 71.49 (1) (dr) of the statutes; relating to: an income tax and franchise tax credit for training apprentices. (FE)
Title
An income tax and franchise tax credit for training apprentices. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Economic Development and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb448 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/SB448.pdf |