WI SB447 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 968.255 (2) (a); to amend 968.255 (1) (a), 968.255 (2) (intro.) and 968.255 (2) (b), (c), (d) and (e); and to create 968.255 (1) (a) 5. and 968.255 (2) (ag) of the statutes; Relating to: strip searches. (FE)
Title
Strip searches. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Leibham [R] | Sen. Duey Stroebel [R] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. Garey Bies [R] |
Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Mark Born [R] | Sen. Howard Marklein [R] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] |
Rep. Donald Pridemore [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Sen. Jeff Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senator Leibham |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Leibham |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-01-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-01-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-12-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Labor |
2013-12-16 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb447 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/SB447.pdf |