WI SB447 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 16.705 (1), 16.705 (2), 16.705 (3) and 16.705 (6); to amend 16.705 (7), 16.705 (8) (a), 23.41 (5), 25.18 (1) (a), 25.18 (1) (f), 25.18 (1) (m), 84.01 (13), 84.06 (2) (a), 84.06 (3), 84.06 (4), 85.015, 102.81 (2), 165.08, 165.25 (11), 221.0903 (4) (b), 801.02 (1), 803.09 (1) and (2), 804.01 (2) (intro.), 805.04 (2m) and 893.981; and to create 16.42 (1) (h), 16.46 (10), 16.705 (1) (a) 3., (b) and (c), 16.705 (2) (a) 3. and 4., (b) and (c), 16.705 (3) (am) 4., 16.705 (3) (bm), 16.705 (4), 16.705 (5g), (5m) and (5r), 16.705 (6) (a), 16.705 (9), 16.75 (1) (a) 4., 16.771, 16.871, 20.932, 66.0902 and 84.06 (13) of the statutes; relating to: state contractual services and false claims submitted to state and local governments, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, and providing penalties.
Title
State contractual services and false claims submitted to state and local governments, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, and providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-20 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-20 | Report passage as amended recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4 | |
2010-04-20 | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 3 | |
2010-04-20 | Report introduction and adoption of Senate Amendment 2 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 by joint committee on Finance | |
2010-04-20 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4 | |
2010-04-20 | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 by joint committee on Finance | |
2010-04-20 | Report introduction and adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 by joint committee on Finance | |
2010-04-20 | Report introduction of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 3 by joint committee on Finance | |
2010-04-20 | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 3 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 by joint committee on Finance | |
2010-04-19 | Executive action taken | |
2010-04-02 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-03-19 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-23 | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e) | |
2010-02-10 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-02-10 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Ethics Reform and Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2010-02-10 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by committee on Ethics Reform and Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2010-02-10 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Ethics Reform and Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2010-02-10 | Executive action taken | |
2010-02-10 | Senate amendment 2 offered by Senator Lassa | |
2010-02-10 | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Lassa | |
2010-02-10 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-10 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-01-25 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-01-21 | Senator Ellis added as a coauthor | |
2010-01-20 | Public hearing held | |
2010-01-07 | Read first time and referred to committee on Ethics Reform and Government Operations | |
2010-01-07 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb447 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB447.pdf |