WI SB442 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.455 (2) (hd) and 48.48 (19); and to create 20.437 (1) (hf), 814.75 (28), 814.76 (21), 944.35 and 973.05 (2m) (fr) of the statutes; Relating to: prostitution crime surcharge and making appropriations. (FE)
Title
Prostitution crime surcharge and making appropriations. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-10-09 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb442 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB442.pdf |