WI SB441 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-5)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-5)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 66.0602 (3) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: changes to the local levy limit calculation for a political subdivision that transfers responsibility to provide a governmental service to another governmental unit. (FE)
Title
Changes to the local levy limit calculation for a political subdivision that transfers responsibility to provide a governmental service to another governmental unit. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Petrowski withdrawn as a coauthor |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Representative Subeck withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Senator Miller withdrawn as a coauthor |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Representative Anderson withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Representative Ramthun added as a cosponsor |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Representative Hesselbein withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2019-10-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb441 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB441.pdf |