WI SB440 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 100.26 (1); and to create 100.70 of the statutes; Relating to: authorizing the Wisconsin Propane Education and Research Council to levy an assessment.
Title
Authorizing the Wisconsin Propane Education and Research Council to levy an assessment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 4, Noes 0 |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 4, Noes 0 |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Representative Zepnick added as a cosponsor |
2017-10-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2017-10-09 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb440 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB440.pdf |