WI SB440 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Published 4-4-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Published 4-4-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 66.1105 (4) (h) 2.; and to create 66.1105 (4) (h) 9., 66.1105 (6) (a) 10. and 66.1105 (6) (am) 2. e. of the statutes; relating to: increasing the allowable number of project plan amendments, and lengthening the time during which tax increments may be allocated and expenditures for project costs may be made, for Tax Incremental District Number 3 in the city of Middleton. (FE)
Title
Increasing the allowable number of project plan amendments, and lengthening the time during which tax increments may be allocated and expenditures for project costs may be made, for Tax Incremental District Number 3 in the city of Middleton. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Grothman [R] | Sen. Jon Erpenbach [D] | Sen. Fred Risser [D] | Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] |
Sen. Kelda Roys [D] | Rep. Sondy Pope [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-15 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 56 N: 35 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Senate | Published 4-4-2012 |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-21-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 139 |
2012-03-20 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-20-2012 |
2012-03-19 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 3-19-2012 |
2012-03-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2012-03-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-15 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 56, Noes 35 |
2012-03-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-03-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-15 | House | Read a second time |
2012-03-06 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:25 A.M. on 3-13-2012 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 22 |
2012-03-02 | House | Placed on calendar 3-6-2012 by committee on Rules |
2012-02-29 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2012-02-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 31, Noes 2 |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Read a second time |
2012-02-20 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-21-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-02-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-02-20 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Report passage recommended by committee on Economic Development and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 6, Noes 1 |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Economic Development and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Introduced |