WI SB440 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on February 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-09 - Published 2-18-2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on February 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-09 - Published 2-18-2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 66.0301 (1) (a); and to create 66.1103 (2) (k) 22., 66.1104 and 560.033 of the statutes; relating to: waiving certain federal bond limitations allocated to cities and counties and requiring the Department of Commerce to develop a system for reallocating the bond limitations to other state and local units of government.
Title
Waiving certain federal bond limitations allocated to cities and counties and requiring the Department of Commerce to develop a system for reallocating the bond limitations to other state and local units of government.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | Published 2-18-2010. | |
2010-02-05 | Report approved by the Governor on 2-5-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 112 | |
2010-02-02 | Presented to the Governor on 2-2-2010 | |
2010-02-01 | Report correctly enrolled on 2-1-2010 | |
2010-02-01 | LRB correction (Senate Amendment 2) | |
2010-02-01 | LRB correction (Senate Amendment 2 to Senate Amendment 2) | |
2010-01-29 | Received from Assembly concurred in | |
2010-01-28 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-01-28 | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 90, Noes 6 | |
2010-01-28 | Rules suspended | |
2010-01-28 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-01-28 | Read a second time | |
2010-01-28 | Rules suspended and taken up | |
2010-01-28 | Read | |
2010-01-28 | Received from Senate | |
2010-01-28 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-01-28 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 1 | |
2010-01-28 | Rules suspended | |
2010-01-28 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-01-28 | Senate amendment 5 adopted | |
2010-01-28 | Senate amendment 5 offered by Senators Lassa and Miller | |
2010-01-28 | Senate amendment 4 withdrawn and returned to author | |
2010-01-28 | Senate amendment 4 offered by Senators Lassa and Miller | |
2010-01-28 | Senate amendment 3 withdrawn and returned to author | |
2010-01-28 | Senate amendment 3 offered by Senators Erpenbach and Risser | |
2010-01-28 | Senate amendment 2 adopted | |
2010-01-28 | Senate amendment 2 to Senate amendment 2 adopted | |
2010-01-28 | Placed at the foot of the calendar of 1-28-2010 | |
2010-01-28 | Senate amendment 2 to Senate amendment 2 offered by Senators Lassa and Miller | |
2010-01-28 | Senate amendment 1 to Senate amendment 2 adopted | |
2010-01-28 | Placed after Assembly Bill 456 on the calendar 1-28-2010 | |
2010-01-28 | Read a second time | |
2010-01-27 | Placed on calendar 1-28-2010 by committee on Senate Organization | |
2010-01-26 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-01-26 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Economic Development, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2010-01-26 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by committee on Economic Development, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2010-01-26 | Report introduction and adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 2 recommended by committee on Economic Development, Ayes 7, Noes 0 by committee on Economic Development | |
2010-01-26 | Executive action taken | |
2010-01-25 | Senate amendment 2 offered by Senators Lassa and Darling | |
2010-01-25 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-01-22 | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Risser | |
2010-01-07 | Public hearing held | |
2010-01-06 | Senator Darling withdrawn as a coauthor | |
2009-12-23 | Read first time and referred to committee on Economic Development | |
2009-12-23 | Introduced |