WI SB434 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 16.75 (12); to renumber and amend 16.953; and to create 16.953 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: state agency goals for the generation or purchase of electric energy derived from renewable resources. (FE)
Title
State agency goals for the generation or purchase of electric energy derived from renewable resources. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections and Utilities |
2017-10-09 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb434 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB434.pdf |