WI SB434 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 254.71 (1); to amend 254.71 (2), 254.71 (3) and 254.71 (6) (b); and to create 66.0436, 254.71 (1g) and 254.71 (1r) (b) and (c) of the statutes; Relating to: requirements and local ordinances related to certificates of food protection practices. (FE)
Title
Requirements and local ordinances related to certificates of food protection practices. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Published 4-17-2014 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 292 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-15-2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 concurred in |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-1-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-03-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in as amended |
2014-03-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-03-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-03-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Thiesfeldt and Schraa |
2014-03-20 | House | Read a second time |
2014-03-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:36 AM on 3-20-2014 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2014-03-18 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2014-03-12 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Farrow |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Introduced |