WI SB431 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-4)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-4)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 29.194 (1) (b), 29.235 (3m), 29.563 (4) (a) 2s. and 29.563 (4) (b) 2s.; and to create 29.001 (14) and 45.13 of the statutes; Relating to: hunting, trapping, and fishing approvals issued to recipients of a medal awarded by the U.S. armed forces that is equal to or higher than the Purple Heart medal in order of precedence and maintenance of a list of such medals by the Department of Veterans Affairs. (FE)
Title
Hunting, trapping, and fishing approvals issued to recipients of a medal awarded by the U.S. armed forces that is equal to or higher than the Purple Heart medal in order of precedence and maintenance of a list of such medals by the Department of Veterans Affairs. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Representative Sinicki added as a cosponsor |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry |
2017-10-09 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb431 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB431.pdf |