WI SB430 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 85.155 of the statutes; Relating to: sale of surplus real property owned by the Department of Transportation. (FE)
Title
Sale of surplus real property owned by the Department of Transportation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Felzkowski |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Introduced |