WI SB424 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-14)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 48.651 (1d) (am), 48.67 (6), 48.675 and 97.67 (8) of the statutes; Relating to: testing for lead in drinking water in facilities used for recreational and educational camps and child care. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Testing for lead in drinking water in facilities used for recreational and educational camps and child care. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-01HouseFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2020-02-18HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2020-01-21HouseReceived from Senate
2020-01-21SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2020-01-21SenateRead a third time and passed
2020-01-21SenateRules suspended
2020-01-21SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-01-21SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2020-01-21SenateRead a second time
2020-01-17SenatePlaced on calendar 1-21-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2020-01-09SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-01-09SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2020-01-09SenateReport adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2020-01-08SenateExecutive action taken
2020-01-03SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles
2019-10-22SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-10-02SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-10-01SenatePublic hearing held
2019-09-17SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2019-09-17SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback