WI SB421 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on November 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-27 - Published 11-28-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on November 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-27 - Published 11-28-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 23.0917 (5g) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: amounts obligated under the Warren Knowles-Gaylord Nelson Stewardship 2000 Program for water infrastructure projects in state parks. (FE)
Title
Amounts obligated under the Warren Knowles-Gaylord Nelson Stewardship 2000 Program for water infrastructure projects in state parks. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-27 | Senate | Published 11-28-2017 |
2017-11-27 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-27-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 71 |
2017-11-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-22-2017 |
2017-11-22 | Senate | LRB correction |
2017-11-22 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-11-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-11-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-09 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2017-11-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-09 | House | Read a second time |
2017-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-9-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-11-07 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2017-10-31 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Senator Vinehout added as a coauthor |
2017-10-27 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-31-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Representative Mursau added as a cosponsor |
2017-10-02 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2017-10-02 | Senate | Introduced |