WI SB42 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-6)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-6)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 38.12 (4), 59.14 (2), 62.11 (4) (a), 64.34 (1) and 120.11 (4); to amend 61.32 and 985.05 (1); and to create 38.12 (4) (b), 59.14 (2) (b), 62.11 (4) (a) 2., 64.34 (1) (b) and 120.11 (4) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: publication of proceedings of meetings held by certain governmental bodies.
Title
Publication of proceedings of meetings held by certain governmental bodies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Stroebel and L. Taylor |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb42 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB42.pdf |