WI SB419 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Passed on April 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Published 4-26-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Passed on April 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Published 4-26-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 20.485 (2) (q) and 45.435; and to create 20.485 (2) (qm) and 45.437 of the statutes; Relating to: a veterans employment and entrepreneurship grant program, veteran employment grants, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
A veterans employment and entrepreneurship grant program, veteran employment grants, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-16 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | Senate | Published 4-26-2016 |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-25-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 385 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-21-2016 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-16 | House | Representative Meyers added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 98, Noes 0 |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-02-11 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senator Wanggaard added as a coauthor |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senator Nass added as a coauthor |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senator Lassa added as a coauthor |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senator Hansen added as a coauthor |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-12-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Introduced |