WI SB418 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 125.28 (5) (b) and 125.54 (7) (a) 2.; to renumber 125.54 (7) (a) 1.; to renumber and amend 125.51 (4) (br) 2. and 125.69 (1) (a); to amend 125.02 (10), 125.02 (15) (b), 125.02 (16) (intro.), 125.02 (21), 125.04 (9), 125.10 (4), 125.25 (2) (b) 5., 125.28 (5) (c), 125.29 (3) (h), 125.295 (1) (a), 125.295 (2) (a) 1., 125.295 (2) (a) 6. a., 125.295 (2) (a) 6. b., 125.295 (2) (a) 6. e., 125.295 (3) (a), 125.295 (3) (b), 125.295 (3) (c), 125.33 (9), 125.51 (2) (am), 125.51 (3) (f), 125.51 (4) (a) 1., 125.52 (1) (b) 1., 125.52 (3), 125.54 (1), 125.54 (8), 125.545 (1) (d), 125.58 (1), 125.68 (4) (c) 3m., 125.68 (9) (b), 125.68 (9) (d), 125.68 (10), 125.69 (title), 125.69 (1) (b) 1., 125.69 (1) (c), 125.69 (1) (d), 125.69 (3), 125.69 (4) (e), 125.69 (6) (a), 125.70, 139.01 (5), 139.01 (6), 139.01 (10), 139.03 (2x) (a), 139.04 (4), 139.06 (3), 139.08 (4), 139.09, 139.11 (2), 139.11 (3), 139.11 (4) (b) 2., 139.18 (2), 139.22 and 346.93 (1); and to create 125.02 (5g), (5i) and (5k), 125.295 (3m), 125.51 (4) (br) 1. i., 125.51 (4) (br) 2. b., 125.52 (8), 125.525, 125.53 (3), 125.69 (1) (a) 3., 125.69 (1) (b) 3., 125.69 (4) (c) and 139.01 (2o) of the statutes; Relating to: creating a distillpub permit authorizing the manufacture, rectification, and sale of distilled spirits; retail interests relating to distillpubs and brewpubs; quotas for retail intoxicating liquor licenses; location and production limits on brewpubs; retail sales of intoxicating liquor by brewers; retail licenses held by wineries and closing hours for retail sales by wineries; small winery cooperative wholesalers; minimum customer requirements for alcohol beverage wholesalers; and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Creating a distillpub permit authorizing the manufacture, rectification, and sale of distilled spirits; retail interests relating to distillpubs and brewpubs; quotas for retail intoxicating liquor licenses; location and production limits on brewpubs; retail sales of intoxicating liquor by brewers; retail licenses held by wineries and closing hours for retail sales by wineries; small winery cooperative wholesalers; minimum customer requirements for alcohol beverage wholesalers; and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-02 | Senate | Senator Shilling added as a coauthor |
2017-09-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-09-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues |
2017-09-21 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb418 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB418.pdf |