WI SB417 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 66.0501 (1); to amend 66.0511 (title); and to create 66.0511 (1) (am), 66.0511 (1) (ar), 66.0511 (1) (c) and 66.0511 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: eligibility for appointment as a law enforcement or correctional officer.
Title
Eligibility for appointment as a law enforcement or correctional officer.
Sponsors
Sen. Jesse James [R] | Rep. Shae Sortwell [R] | Rep. William Penterman [R] | Rep. Samba Baldeh [D] |
Rep. Paul Melotik [R] | Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D] | Rep. Sylvia Ortiz-Velez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor |
2023-10-12 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Introduced |