WI SB415 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 121.15 (1) (a) 1. and 121.15 (1) (a) 2. to 5.; to renumber 121.15 (1) (a) 6.; to renumber and amend 121.15 (1) (a); and to create 121.15 (1) (a) 2. to 6. of the statutes; Relating to: the timing of equalization aid payments to school districts. (FE)
Title
The timing of equalization aid payments to school districts. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-10-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb415 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB415.pdf |