WI SB415 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-3)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 343.50 (4); and to create 343.14 (2) (k) and 343.14 (8) of the statutes; Relating to: reporting on an operator license or identification card application the existence of a disability that is not immediately apparent to another. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reporting on an operator license or identification card application the existence of a disability that is not immediately apparent to another. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03SenatePublished 4-4-2018
2018-04-03SenateReport approved by the Governor on 4-3-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 244
2018-04-02SenatePresented to the Governor on 4-2-2018
2018-03-02SenateReport correctly enrolled
2018-02-23SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2018-02-22HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-22HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2018-02-22HouseRules suspended
2018-02-22HouseOrdered to a third reading
2018-02-22HouseRead a second time
2018-02-21HouseMade a special order of business at 2:04 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
2018-02-21HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2018-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2018-02-20SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-20SenateRead a third time and passed
2018-02-20SenateRules suspended
2018-02-20SenateOrdered to a third reading
2018-02-20SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2018-02-20SenateRead a second time
2018-02-19SenateSenator Cowles added as a coauthor
2018-02-16SenatePlaced on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2018-02-06SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-02-06SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2018-02-06SenateReport adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2018-02-06SenateExecutive action taken
2018-01-30SenatePublic hearing held
2018-01-29SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin
2017-11-14SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin
2017-11-07SenateRepresentative Zepnick added as a cosponsor
2017-10-27SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-09-21SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs
2017-09-21SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback