WI SB412 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 19.56 (3) (f) and 19.59 (1) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: allowing local public officials to receive anything of value that the Wisconsin Economic Development Corporation or the Department of Tourism is authorized to provide.
Title
Allowing local public officials to receive anything of value that the Wisconsin Economic Development Corporation or the Department of Tourism is authorized to provide.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Nass [R] | Rep. Tyler August [R] | Rep. Amy Loudenbeck [R] | Rep. David Steffen [R] |
Rep. Robert Kulp [R] | Rep. Bob Gannon [R] | Rep. Keith Ripp [R] | Sen. Mary Felzkowski [R] |
Rep. Mike Kuglitsch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Executive session held |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb412 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB412.pdf |