WI SB411 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 84.1036 (1); to amend 84.1036 (title) and 84.1036 (2); and to create 84.1036 (1) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: designating the Richard I. Bong Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating the Richard I. Bong Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-10-02 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-09-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs |
2019-09-16 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb411 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB411.pdf |