WI SB411 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Published 4-16-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Published 4-16-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 167.31 (4) (e); to amend 29.024 (2) (d), 29.171 (4) (b) (intro.), 29.314 (4) (b) 2., 29.314 (5) (b) 2., 29.337 (1) (intro.), 29.563 (14) (a) 3., 29.563 (14) (c) 3., 29.977 (1) (d) and 29.983 (1) (b) 4.; and to create 20.370 (5) (fv), 29.179 (1) (a) 10m., 29.180 (1) (a) 10m., 29.185, 29.337 (1) (c), 29.553 (1) (hr), 29.563 (4) (a) 3., 29.563 (4) (b) 3., 29.888 and 167.31 (4) (e) 2. of the statutes; relating to: hunting and trapping of wolves, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Hunting and trapping of wolves, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 69 N: 25 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 7 laid on table (Y: 57 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 6 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 5 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 4 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 34 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 7 laid on table (Y: 57 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 6 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 5 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 4 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 34 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Senate | Published 4-16-2012 |
2012-04-03 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-2-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 169 |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-30-2012 |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 3-28-2012 |
2012-03-28 | Senate | LRB correction |
2012-03-28 | Senate | LRB correction |
2012-03-28 | Senate | LRB correction |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2012-03-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-13 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 69, Noes 25 |
2012-03-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-03-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-13 | House | Assembly amendment 7 laid on table, Ayes 57, Noes 37 |
2012-03-13 | House | Assembly amendment 7 offered by Representatives Molepske Jr, Mason, Milroy and Clark |
2012-03-13 | House | Assembly amendment 6 laid on table, Ayes 58, Noes 36 |
2012-03-13 | House | Assembly amendment 6 offered by Representative Molepske Jr |
2012-03-13 | House | Assembly amendment 5 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 31 |
2012-03-13 | House | Assembly amendment 4 laid on table, Ayes 58, Noes 36 |
2012-03-13 | House | Assembly amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 59, Noes 35 |
2012-03-13 | House | Assembly amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 59, Noes 35 |
2012-03-13 | House | Assembly amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 59, Noes 34 |
2012-03-13 | House | Read a second time |
2012-03-13 | House | Representative Kleefisch added as a cosponsor |
2012-03-06 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:18 A.M. on 3-13-2012 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 22 |
2012-03-06 | House | Assembly amendment 5 offered by Representative Sinicki |
2012-03-06 | House | Assembly amendment 4 offered by Representatives Clark, Hulsey, Molepske Jr and Danou |
2012-03-06 | House | Assembly amendment 3 offered by Representatives Clark, Molepske Jr, Hulsey and Danou |
2012-03-06 | House | Assembly amendment 2 offered by Representatives Clark, Molepske Jr, Hulsey, Danou, Mason and Milroy |
2012-03-06 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representatives Molepske Jr and Clark |
2012-03-06 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2012-03-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 24, Noes 9 |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Senate amendment 5 laid on table |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Senate amendment 5 offered by Senator Taylor |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Senate amendment 4 adopted |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Senate amendment 4 offered by Senator Moulton |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Senate amendment 3 adopted |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 adopted |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Read a second time |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-6-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Senate amendment 3 offered by Senator Moulton |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Natural Resources and Environment, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Natural Resources and Environment, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Senate amendment 2 offered by Senator Moulton |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Moulton |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-06 | Senate | LRB correction |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Senator Grothman added as a coauthor |
2012-01-31 | Senate | Senator Schultz added as a coauthor |
2012-01-31 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources and Environment |
2012-01-31 | Senate | Introduced |