WI SB410 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 66.05105 and 230.49 of the statutes; Relating to: anti-racism and anti-sexism training for employees of state government and local government. (FE)
Title
Anti-racism and anti-sexism training for employees of state government and local government. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Representatives Schraa and Dittrich added as cosponsors |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Introduced |