WI SB410 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-3)
Status: Passed on December 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-06 - Published 12-7-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-3)
Status: Passed on December 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-06 - Published 12-7-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 321.40 (3) (b) 3.; and to amend 321.40 (3) (a), 321.40 (3) (b) 2. and 321.40 (3) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: the tuition grant program for national guard members administered by the Department of Military Affairs. (FE)
Title
The tuition grant program for national guard members administered by the Department of Military Affairs. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-06 | Senate | Published 12-7-2017 |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 12-6-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 123 |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 12-4-2017 |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-11-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-09 | House | Representative Barca added as a cosponsor |
2017-11-09 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2017-11-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-09 | House | Read a second time |
2017-11-09 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2017-11-07 | House | Read first time and referred to calendar of 11-9-2017 |
2017-11-07 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-7-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-10-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Universities and Technical Colleges, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-10-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Technical Colleges |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Introduced |