WI SB410 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Published 4-26-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Published 4-26-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 348.17 (5) of the statutes; relating to: seasonal weight limitations for certain vehicles transporting manure. (FE)
Title
Seasonal weight limitations for certain vehicles transporting manure. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | Senate | Published 4-26-2012 |
2012-04-13 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-12-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 279 |
2012-04-05 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-5-2012 |
2012-03-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 3-2-2012 |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2012-02-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-02-21 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2012-02-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-02-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-02-21 | House | Read a second time |
2012-02-21 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2012-02-21 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2012-02-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Senate substitute amendment 1 adopted |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Read a second time |
2012-02-20 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-21-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Transportation and Elections, Ayes 4, Noes 0 |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Transportation and Elections, Ayes 4, Noes 0 |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2012-02-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator Galloway |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2012-01-31 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation and Elections |
2012-01-31 | Senate | Introduced |