WI SB41 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Available for scheduling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating to: applications for the full-time open enrollment program in the 2020-21 and 2021-22 school years and the family income requirement for the Wisconsin Parental Choice Program in the 2021-22 school year. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Applications for the full-time open enrollment program in the 2020-21 and 2021-22 school years and the family income requirement for the Wisconsin Parental Choice Program in the 2021-22 school year. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-05-04SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 4, Noes 3
2021-05-03SenateExecutive action taken
2021-04-21SenatePublic hearing held
2021-04-14SenateRepresentative Allen added as a cosponsor
2021-03-04SenateRepresentative Ramthun added as a cosponsor
2021-02-17SenateFiscal estimate received
2021-01-28SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Education
2021-01-28SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback