WI SB409 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 36.42, 38.21 and 38.28 (2) (dm) of the statutes; Relating to: anti-racism and anti-sexism student instruction and anti-racism and anti-sexism training for employees at the University of Wisconsin System and the Technical College System. (FE)
Title
Anti-racism and anti-sexism student instruction and anti-racism and anti-sexism training for employees at the University of Wisconsin System and the Technical College System. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 60 N: 32 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 32 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 32 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Refused to reconsider vote by which Senate Bill 409 passed offered by Senator LeMahieu (Y: 13 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Refused to refer to committee on Senate Organization (Y: 12 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Move to call the question (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 60 N: 32 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 32 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 32 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Refused to reconsider vote by which Senate Bill 409 passed offered by Senator LeMahieu (Y: 13 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Refused to refer to committee on Senate Organization (Y: 12 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Move to call the question (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Report vetoed by the Governor on 4-15-2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-14-2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 60, Noes 33, Paired 2 |
2022-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Decision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 60, Noes 32 |
2022-02-22 | House | Decision of the Chair appealed |
2022-02-22 | House | Point of order that Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 (3)(f) well taken |
2022-02-22 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 60, Noes 32 |
2022-02-22 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 60, Noes 32 |
2022-02-22 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Hong, Shankland, Anderson, Baldeh, Billings, Brostoff, Conley, Considine, Drake, Emerson, Goyke, Haywood, B. Meyers, Moore Omokunde, Neubauer, S. Rodriguez, Shelton, Sinicki, Snodgrass, Spreitzer, Stubbs, Subeck, Vining and Vruwink |
2022-02-22 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representatives L. Myers, Stubbs, Baldeh, Drake, Haywood, Moore Omokunde, Anderson, Billings, Brostoff, Conley, Considine, Emerson, Goyke, Hong, B. Meyers, Neubauer, S. Rodriguez, Shankland, Shelton, Sinicki, Snodgrass, Spreitzer, Subeck, Vining and Vruwink |
2022-02-22 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Stubbs, Haywood, Baldeh, Drake, Moore Omokunde, Anderson, Billings, Brostoff, Conley, Considine, Emerson, Goyke, Hong, B. Meyers, Neubauer, S. Rodriguez, Shankland, Shelton, Sinicki, Snodgrass, Spreitzer, Subeck, Vining and Vruwink |
2022-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from Senate message and take up |
2022-02-22 | House | Read |
2022-02-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Messaged |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Refused to reconsider vote by which Senate Bill 409 passed offered by Senator LeMahieu, Ayes 13, Noes 20 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Passed, Ayes 21, Noes 12 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Refused to refer to committee on Senate Organization, Ayes 12, Noes 21 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Move to call the question, Ayes 21, Noes 12 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a third time |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Universities and Technical Colleges, Ayes 5, Noes 4 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Universities and Technical Colleges, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-11-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2021-10-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Representative Schraa added as a cosponsor |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Technical Colleges |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Introduced |