WI SB406 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: grants for the relocation of coal piles in the city of Green Bay. (FE)
Title
Grants for the relocation of coal piles in the city of Green Bay. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Wimberger [R] | Sen. Robert Cowles [R] | Rep. David Steffen [R] | Rep. John Macco [R] |
Rep. Joel Kitchens [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wimberger |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Introduced |