WI SB406 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 757.02 (2) of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting a judge from holding a nonjudicial office of public trust while serving in the office to which the judge was appointed or elected.
Title
Prohibiting a judge from holding a nonjudicial office of public trust while serving in the office to which the judge was appointed or elected.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-10-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-10-07 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-09-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues |
2019-09-16 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb406 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB406.pdf |