WI SB405 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 74.37 (3) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: providing evidence in defense of a claim for excessive assessment.
Title
Providing evidence in defense of a claim for excessive assessment.
Sponsors
Sen. Sheila Harsdorf [R] | Sen. Janet Bewley [D] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Rep. Todd Novak [R] |
Rep. Gordon Hintz [D] | Rep. James Edming [R] | Rep. David Steffen [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Olsen |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb405 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB405.pdf |