WI SB404 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Published 3-29-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Published 3-29-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 183.0114 (1) (a); and to create 183.0114 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: the fee for filing limited liability company articles of organization with the Department of Financial Institutions. (FE)
Title
The fee for filing limited liability company articles of organization with the Department of Financial Institutions. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Published 3-29-2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-28-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 177 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2018 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Representative Barca added as a cosponsor |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 94, Noes 0 |
2018-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-15 | House | Made a special order of business at 2:27 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26 |
2018-01-25 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2018-01-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 31, Noes 0 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-23-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin |
2017-09-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Introduced |