WI SB403 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 165.85 (3) (cm); to amend 165.85 (2) (bv), 165.85 (2) (c), 165.85 (3) (a) and 165.85 (3) (b); and to create 165.85 (2) (ap), 165.85 (2) (be), 165.85 (2) (fm), 165.85 (3) (am), 165.85 (3) (cm) 6. and 165.85 (4) (em) of the statutes; Relating to: the responsibilities of the Law Enforcement Standards Board.
Title
The responsibilities of the Law Enforcement Standards Board.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Testin [R] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Sen. Alberta Darling [R] |
Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] | Rep. Jim Ott [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] |
Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. John Spiros [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-11-17 | Senate | Representative Krug added as a cosponsor |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb403 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB403.pdf |