WI SB403 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 62.23 (7) (hc) (title) and 62.23 (7) (hc) 1. (intro.); and to create 59.69 (10) (at) of the statutes; Relating to: replacement of certain nonconforming structures that are destroyed by vandalism or certain natural forces and manufactured home communities that are nonconforming uses.
Title
Replacement of certain nonconforming structures that are destroyed by vandalism or certain natural forces and manufactured home communities that are nonconforming uses.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lasee [R] | Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] | Rep. Adam Jarchow [R] | Rep. Tom Larson [R] |
Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Michael Schraa [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Housing, and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Housing, and Trade |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb403 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB403.pdf |