WI SB402 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 940.20 (3) (title) and 940.20 (3); to amend 48.685 (2) (bb), 48.685 (5) (bm) 4., 48.686 (1) (c) 9., 48.686 (1) (c) 12., 48.686 (2) (bb), 50.065 (2) (bb), 165.70 (1) (b), 165.84 (7) (ab) 2., 301.048 (2) (bm) 1. a., 767.461 (4), 940.03, 941.29 (1g) (a), 941.291 (1) (b), 941.39 (title), 946.82 (4), 949.03 (2), 968.26 (1b) (a) 2. a., 969.08 (10) (b), 973.049 (2) and 973.123 (1); and to create 939.22 (21) (es), 940.202 (1) and (3) and 941.38 (1) (b) 5s. of the statutes; Relating to: battery or threat to jurors and providing a penalty.
Title
Battery or threat to jurors and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2024-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in as amended |
2024-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2024-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-20 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2024-02-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2023-10-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Read a second time |
2023-10-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-10-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-10-12 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2023-10-12 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-09-27 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Introduced |