WI SB400 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 101.05 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: an exception to commercial building code requirements for the installation or operation of a stairway chair lift in a church constructed before 1919.
Title
An exception to commercial building code requirements for the installation or operation of a stairway chair lift in a church constructed before 1919.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Utilities and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-09-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Utilities and Housing |
2019-09-16 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb400 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB400.pdf |