WI SB40 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-1)
Status: Failed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Failed to pass pending partial veto notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-1)
Status: Failed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Failed to pass pending partial veto notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 11.50 (3) (a) 2.; to amend 8.35 (4) (b), 11.12 (2), 11.16 (2), 11.16 (3), 11.26 (1) (a), 11.26 (2) (a), 11.26 (9) (a), 11.26 (9) (b), 11.26 (13), 11.31 (1) (d), 11.50 (1) (a) 1., 11.50 (3) (b), 11.60 (4), 11.61 (2), 20.855 (4) (b) and 71.10 (3) (a); and to create 11.26 (1) (am), 11.26 (2) (an), 11.26 (9) (ba), 11.501 to 11.522, 20.511 (1) (r), 20.585 (1) (q), 20.585 (1) (r), 20.855 (4) (ba), 20.855 (4) (bb), 25.17 (1) (cm) and 25.421 of the statutes; relating to: public financing of campaigns for the office of justice of the supreme court, making appropriations, and providing penalties.
Title
Public financing of campaigns for the office of justice of the supreme court, making appropriations, and providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Failed to pass pending partial veto notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 | |
2010-05-24 | Partial veto placed on calendar 5-25-2010 pursuant to Joint Rule 82(2)(a) | |
2009-12-03 | Published 12-15-2009. | |
2009-12-01 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-12-01 | Report approved by the Governor with partial veto on 12-1-2009. 2009 Wisconsin Act 89 | |
2009-11-30 | Presented to the Governor on 11-30-2009 | |
2009-11-10 | Report correctly enrolled on 11-10-2009 | |
2009-11-06 | Received from Assembly concurred in | |
2009-11-05 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-11-05 | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 51, Noes 42, Paired 2 | |
2009-11-05 | Rules suspended | |
2009-11-05 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-11-05 | Read a second time | |
2009-11-05 | Rules suspended and taken up | |
2009-11-05 | Read | |
2009-11-05 | Received from Senate | |
2009-11-05 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-11-05 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 19, Noes 13 | |
2009-11-05 | Rules suspended | |
2009-11-05 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-11-05 | Decision of the Chair stands as the judgement of the Senate, Ayes 17, Noes 15 | |
2009-11-05 | Point of order that Senate amendment 6 not germane well taken | |
2009-11-05 | Senate amendment 6 offered by Senator Ellis | |
2009-11-05 | Refused to adopt Senate amendment 5, Ayes 15, Noes 17 | |
2009-11-05 | Senate amendment 5 offered by Senator Ellis | |
2009-11-05 | Senate amendment 4 adopted | |
2009-11-05 | Senate amendment 3 adopted | |
2009-11-05 | Senate amendment 2 adopted | |
2009-11-05 | Senate amendment 1 adopted | |
2009-11-05 | Read a second time | |
2009-11-05 | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor | |
2009-11-04 | Placed on calendar 11-5-2009 by committee on Senate Organization | |
2009-11-04 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-11-04 | Report passage as amended recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4 | |
2009-11-04 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 4 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4 | |
2009-11-04 | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 4 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 by joint committee on Finance | |
2009-11-04 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 3 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4 | |
2009-11-04 | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 3 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 by joint committee on Finance | |
2009-11-04 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | |
2009-11-04 | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 by joint committee on Finance | |
2009-11-04 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | |
2009-11-04 | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 by joint committee on Finance | |
2009-11-03 | Executive action taken | |
2009-09-24 | Senator Ellis added as a coauthor | |
2009-09-08 | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e) | |
2009-08-25 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-08-25 | Report passage recommended by committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing, Ayes 3, Noes 2 | |
2009-08-18 | Executive action taken | |
2009-05-27 | Public hearing held | |
2009-04-24 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-04-21 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-04-14 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-02-05 | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing | |
2009-02-05 | Introduced |