WI SB4 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Representatives Edming and Tittl added as cosponsors
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 252.02 (5m) and 252.03 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting certain government officials from mandating vaccination against the 2019 novel coronavirus.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting certain government officials from mandating vaccination against the 2019 novel coronavirus.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01HouseRepresentatives Edming and Tittl added as cosponsors
2021-02-26HouseRepresentative Ramthun added as a cosponsor
2021-02-16HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-16SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2021-02-16SenateRead a third time and passed
2021-02-16SenateRules suspended
2021-02-16SenateOrdered to a third reading
2021-02-16SenateRead a second time
2021-02-15SenateRepresentative Allen added as a cosponsor
2021-02-12SenatePlaced on calendar 2-16-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-01-22SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-01-22SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Human Services, Children and Families, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2021-01-21SenateExecutive action taken
2021-01-21SenatePublic hearing held
2021-01-15SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Human Services, Children and Families
2021-01-15SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback