WI SB4 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 29.519 (1m) (b); and to create 29.519 (1m) (bm) of the statutes; Relating to: a minimum limit on the amount of chubs that may be commercially harvested from the waters of Lake Michigan.
Title
A minimum limit on the amount of chubs that may be commercially harvested from the waters of Lake Michigan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Referred to committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-7-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Report without recommendation pursuant to s. 227.26 (2)(h), Wisconsin Statutes |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Joint Committee for Review of Administrative Rules report received pursuant to s.227.19(6)(a), Wisconsin Statutes |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb4 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB4.pdf |