WI SB399 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Published 4-26-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Published 4-26-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 908.07 and 970.03 (11); and to create 970.038 of the statutes; relating to: the admissibility of hearsay evidence at a preliminary examination.
Title
The admissibility of hearsay evidence at a preliminary examination.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Grothman [R] | Sen. Mary Lazich [R] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Rep. Garey Bies [R] |
Sen. David Craig [R] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. Daniel LeMahieu [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-15 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 63 N: 19 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Assembly: Refused to refer to committee on Judiciary and Ethics (Y: 29 N: 53 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-15 - House - Assembly: Refused to refer to committee on Judiciary and Ethics (Y: 29 N: 53 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | Senate | Published 4-26-2012 |
2012-04-13 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-12-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 285 |
2012-04-05 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-5-2012 |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 3-23-2012 |
2012-03-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2012-03-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-15 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 63, Noes 19 |
2012-03-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-03-15 | House | Refused to refer to committee on Judiciary and Ethics, Ayes 29, Noes 53 |
2012-03-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-15 | House | Read a second time |
2012-03-13 | House | Made a special order of business at 9:15 A.M. on 3-14-2012 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 24 |
2012-03-06 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2012-03-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Read a second time |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-6-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Report passage recommended by committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2012-01-25 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations |
2012-01-25 | Senate | Introduced |