WI SB397 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 43.12 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: county payments to public libraries in adjacent counties. (FE)
Title
County payments to public libraries in adjacent counties. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Substitute Amendment 1) |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Grothman |
2013-12-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-11-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development and Local Government |
2013-11-11 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb397 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/SB397.pdf |