WI SB396 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-3)
Status: Passed on December 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-08 - Published 12-9-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-3)
Status: Passed on December 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-08 - Published 12-9-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 48.415 (9m) (b) 2. a., 48.685 (1) (c) 2., 165.60, 165.70 (1) (b), 440.312 (2), 440.982 (2), 460.05 (1) (h) 1., 460.14 (2m) (a), 901.08 (1) (b), 939.62 (2m) (a) 1m. a., 939.62 (2m) (a) 2m. b., 939.74 (2) (c), 944.31, 973.075 (1) (b) 1m. c. and 973.075 (2) (intro.); and to create 948.081 of the statutes; Relating to: patronization of a child and providing a criminal penalty.
Title
Patronization of a child and providing a criminal penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-08 | Senate | Published 12-9-2017 |
2017-12-08 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 12-8-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 128 |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 12-5-2017 |
2017-11-27 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-11-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-09 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2017-11-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-09 | House | Read a second time |
2017-11-09 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2017-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-9-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-11-06 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2017-10-31 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-10-27 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-31-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator LeMahieu |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Introduced |