WI SB396 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 36.11 (3) (d) (intro.); and to create 20.285 (1) (e), 20.292 (1) (es), 36.11 (3) (e) and 38.14 (15) of the statutes; Relating to: waiver of University of Wisconsin System and technical college application fees and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Waiver of University of Wisconsin System and technical college application fees and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Lena Taylor [D] | Sen. Nikiya Harris Dodd [D] | Sen. Jennifer Shilling [D] | Rep. Terese Berceau [D] |
Rep. Jonathan Brostoff [D] | Sen. Mark Spreitzer [D] | Rep. Chris Taylor [D] | Rep. Leon Young [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-12-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-12-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-11-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Technical Colleges |
2015-11-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb396 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB396.pdf |