WI SB395 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 15.09 (1) (a), 23.09 (23) (a), 23.119 (1) (b), 23.35 (1) (intro.), 23.35 (1) (a), 23.35 (1) (b), 23.35 (1) (e), 23.35 (2), 23.45 (1) (d), 23.50 (1), 23.50 (3), 23.53 (1), 23.56 (1), 23.57 (1) (intro.), 23.58, 23.62 (1) (intro.), 25.29 (1) (a), 30.26 (4) (title), 30.26 (4) (a) (intro.), 30.26 (4) (b), 30.29 (1) (b), 46.03 (18) (f), 59.54 (14) (g), 70.11 (45m), 77.51 (13s), 77.61 (1) (a), 77.61 (1) (b), 77.61 (1) (c), 77.73 (2), 78.01 (2) (e), 78.01 (2m) (f), 78.40 (1), 78.75 (1m) (a) 2m., 78.75 (1m) (a) 3., 100.48 (2), 100.48 (3) (a), 100.48 (4) (c), 110.07 (1) (a) 1., 110.07 (3), 322.111, 344.61 (1), 345.11 (1r), 346.66 (1) (c), 346.71 (1), 346.71 (2), 346.94 (1), 800.02 (2) (b), 814.63 (3m) (a), 814.65 (4m) (a), 885.235 (1m), 885.235 (4), 895.043 (6), 895.049, 901.053, 938.17 (1) (intro.), 940.09 (1m) (b), 940.09 (3), 940.25 (1m) (b), 940.25 (3), 973.06 (1) (j) and 973.09 (2) (a) 1. d.; and to create 15.09 (1) (c), 15.347 (10), 20.370 (1) (jb), 20.370 (3) (ay), 23.119 (1) (at), 23.179, 23.335, 25.40 (1) (bt), 100.48 (1) (bg), 341.059, 343.05 (4) (b) 1m., 347.24 (1) (d) and 938.343 (9m) of the statutes; Relating to: operation of off-highway motorcycles, granting rule-making authority, making appropriations, and providing penalties. (FE)
Title
Operation of off-highway motorcycles, granting rule-making authority, making appropriations, and providing penalties. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] |
Sen. Mary Felzkowski [R] | Rep. Scott Allen [R] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Rep. Thomas Weatherston [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-11-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2015-11-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb395 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB395.pdf |