WI SB394 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 15.405 (1m), 15.407 (11), 101.596 (title), 101.596 (1), 101.596 (2) and 101.596 (3) (title); to renumber and amend 101.596 (3) and 101.625; to amend 101.62 (title) of the statute, 101.63 (2) and 101.64 (3); and to create 101.62 (1) (title), 101.62 (2) (title), 101.62 (3) (title), 101.62 (4) (title), 101.62 (5) (title), 101.62 (5) (a) and 101.62 (5) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: eliminating the Building Inspector Review Board and the Contractor Certification Council and requiring the Uniform Dwelling Code Council to review complaints regarding the inspection of one-family or two-family dwelling construction. (FE)
Title
Eliminating the Building Inspector Review Board and the Contractor Certification Council and requiring the Uniform Dwelling Code Council to review complaints regarding the inspection of one-family or two-family dwelling construction. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lasee [R] | Sen. Steve Nass [R] | Sen. Duey Stroebel [R] | Sen. John Jagler [R] |
Rep. Adam Jarchow [R] | Rep. Bob Gannon [R] | Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R] | Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] |
Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | Published 4-4-2018 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-3-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 240 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-2-2018 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2018-02-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-13 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-02-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-13 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2018-02-13 | House | Read |
2018-01-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-23-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Insurance, Housing and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Insurance, Housing and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Insurance, Housing and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Lasee |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Lasee |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Housing and Trade |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Introduced |